Del Bel, Nicole Christine (CPSO#: 88494)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Del Bel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 24 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: 237 Barton Street East Hamilton, ON L8L 2X2
Date Received: 29 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 24 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2014