Del Paggio, Joseph Cosimo (CPSO#: 100423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
700 University Avenue
Work Station 7W460
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: 416-946-4501
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-4270
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH COSIMO DEL PAGGIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEL PAGGIO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017