Delgado, Diego Hernan (CPSO#: 75468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Nov 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidad del Salvador, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
11 P M B 136
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3940
Fax: (416) 340-4134
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diego Delgado Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Delgado ( CPSO# 75468 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medicine
11 PMB 136
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3940

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 15 Nov 2002 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Nov 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Diego Herman Delgado may practise medicine independently in cardiology.