Delva, Nicholas John (CPSO#: 31316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Delva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Delva ( CPSO# 31100 )
Dr. N. Delva ( CPSO# 31316 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C7
Phone Number: (613) 241-3344

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS JOHN DELVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELVA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1980