Demers, Bruce Adelard (CPSO#: 51409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
101 McIntyre Street West
North Bay ON  P1B 2Y5
Phone: (705) 472-7577 Ext. 7500
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. A. Demers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Demers ( CPSO# 51409 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
101 McIntyre Street West
North Bay ON  P1B 2Y5
Phone Number: (705) 495-7500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE ADELARD DEMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1983