Demers, Catherine (CPSO#: 71265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73324
Fax: (905) 577-1427
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Demers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Demers ( CPSO# 71265 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE DEMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1997