Deneault, Mychele Christine (CPSO#: 69903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinique de la maison mere
9 rue Bruyere
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C9
Canada
Phone: (613) 241-2710
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

435 Rue Lemay
Clarence Creek ON  K0A 1N0
Canada
Phone: (613) 488-2053
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Deneault Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Deneault ( CPSO# 69903 )

Business Address:
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone Number: (613) 446-7677

Business Address:
27 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C9
Phone Number: (613) 241-2710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYCHELE CHRISTINE DENEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENEAULT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998