Denstedt, John Douglas (CPSO#: 50425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Center
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6036
Fax: (519) 646-6037
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 663-3349
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denstedt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Denstedt ( CPSO# 50425 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6036

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3349

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS DENSTEDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENSTEDT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1987