Dervin, Geoffrey Francis (CPSO#: 59592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
Suite W1646
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8081
Fax: (613) 737-8837
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey F. Dervin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dervin ( CPSO# 59592 )

Business Address:
General Campus
Room W1646
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8081

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY FRANCIS DERVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERVIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989