Desai, Dennis (CPSO#: 55414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C M P A
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamilton-Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2006


Corporation Name: Hamilton-Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hamilton ( CPSO# 62212 )
Dr. D. Desai ( CPSO# 55414 )

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Business Address:
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone Number: (613) 725-2000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986