Desbois, Nathalie Annick (CPSO#: 74918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
P O Box 311
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H2
Phone: (905) 689-3301
Fax: (905) 689-5772
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Desbois Medicine Professonal Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Desbois ( CPSO# 74918 )

Business Address:
Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
P O Box 311
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE ANNICK DESBOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESBOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002