Desjardins, Joanne (CPSO#: 70009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
179 Old Highway Road 17
PO Box 305
Plantagenet ON  K0B 1L0
Phone: (613) 673-4318
Fax: (613) 673-4480
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Desjardins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Desjardins ( CPSO# 70009 )

Business Address:
Plantagenet Family Health Team
179 Old Highway 17
PO Box 305
Plantagenet ON  K0B 1L0
Phone Number: (613) 673-4318

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE DESJARDINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESJARDINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1998