Desmarais, Nicole (CPSO#: 68759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hanmer Shopping Center
Box 23
5085 Highway 69 North
Hanmer ON  P3P 1P7
Phone: (705) 969-0628
Fax: (705) 969-0629
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Northwood Medical Clinic
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Canada
Phone: (705) 566-2227
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

St Joseph's Continuing Care Center
1140 South Bay Road
Sudbury
Sudbury ON  P3E 0B6
Canada
Phone: (705) 674-3846
Fax: (705) 673-1009
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Desmarais Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2007


Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Desmarais Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. N Desmarais Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Desmarais ( CPSO# 68759 )

Business Address:
Hanmer Shopping Center
5085 Highway 69 North
Box 23
Hanmer ON  P3P 1P7
Phone Number: (705) 969-0627

Business Address:
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P2A 1Y8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE DESMARAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESMARAIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997