Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Devenyi, Robert George (CPSO#: 52547)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
6 E W 438
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5602
Fax: (416) 603-6473
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Devenyi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Devenyi ( CPSO# 52547 )

Business Address:
208 - 6 Maggin Mews
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 449-3937

Business Address:
The Toronto Hospital - Western Division
Suite 6EW - 438
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5602

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE DEVENYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVENYI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1984