Devito, Isabella (CPSO#: 50429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Isabella Devito Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Devito ( CPSO# 50429 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite 19- 104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Business Address:
Suite BEN - 437
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 3L4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5164

Business Address:
Suite 600
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISABELLA DEVITO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVITO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1987