Devlin, Timothy Boyer (CPSO#: 50430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 312
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 298-2024
Fax: (416) 298-0454
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5963
Fax: (416) 350-5980
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 105
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy B. Devlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Devlin ( CPSO# 50430 )
Dr. M. Devlin ( CPSO# 95736 )

Business Address:
312 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 298-2024

Business Address:
105 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 298-2024

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital - Grace Campus
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 295-2600

Business Address:
Medcan Clinic
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-2186

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY BOYER DEVLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1984