Dhillon, Ripple (CPSO#: 65519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjab University India, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 5441
Fax: (905) 721-6685
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ripple Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dhillon ( CPSO# 65519 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4300

Business Address:
82 Park Road North
Oshawa ON  L1J 4L1
Phone Number: (905) 721-4300

Business Address:
1635 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2K9

Business Address:
431 Woodmount Drive
Oshawa ON  L1G 8E3

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RIPPLE DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993