Di Cecco, Robert (CPSO#: 66639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6152
Fax: (519) 646-6127
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Strathroy Middlesex General Hosp
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Di Cecco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Di Cecco ( CPSO# 66639 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite B2-440
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6152

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-5295

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
D1-210 - 268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6152

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DI CECCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI CECCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998