Di Diodato, Giulio (CPSO#: 71505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 739-5612
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giulio DiDiodato Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Di Diodato ( CPSO# 71505 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 739-5612

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIULIO DI DIODATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI DIODATO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2001