Di Fabio, Jonathan Michael (CPSO#: 93569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd.
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: 705 759 3434
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Di Fabio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Di Fabio ( CPSO# 93569 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN MICHAEL DI FABIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI FABIO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015