Di Pierdomenico, Fernando (CPSO#: 31634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Feb 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
290 Sandwich Street South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 2A8
Phone: (519) 736-2131
Fax: (519) 736-5030
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Di Pierdomenico Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Di Pierdomenico ( CPSO# 31634 )

Business Address:
290 Sandwich Street South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 2A8
Phone Number: (519) 736-2131

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 Feb 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 10 Feb 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 10, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Fernando Di
            Pierdomenico in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Di
            Pierdomenico to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. FERNANDO DI PIERDOMENICO
                                          ("Dr. Di Pierdomenico")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

            "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the
            Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

            "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the
            College.

            (2)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, certificate of registration number 31634, am a
                  member of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge that the College has concerns about
                  my standard of practice arising from a reassessment report dated May 14,
                  2015, which is the subject of the College matter bearing File Number
                  197050 (the "May 14, 2015 Reassessment Report").

            (4)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge that, upon receiving an original copy
                  of this Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to take no
                  further action on the May 14, 2015 Reassessment Report.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it. 

            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, undertake to practise under the guidance of
                        a clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for nine (9) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge that I have reviewed the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix
                        "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).
                        The Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me and review at least fifteen (15) of my patient
                              charts once every other week for a minimum of six (6) weeks.
                              If the Supervisor recommends that the Clinical Supervision
                              step down and the College approves, the Supervisor will meet
                              with me and review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts
                              once every month for the remaining period of Clinical
                              Supervision;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least after each
                              meeting, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall
                        be selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the May
                        14, 2015 Reassessment Report, and concerns that may arise during
                        the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, undertake to cooperate fully with the
                        Clinical Supervision of my practice, as described in this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to
                        this Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within
                        thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        thirty (30) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, agree that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, agree that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, undertake that, approximately six (6)
                        months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in
                        section (6) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
                        Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
                        review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment and to abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, understand and agree that if I am of the
                        view that any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are
                        unreasonable, I will have  thirty (30) days following my receipt of
                        the recommendations within which to provide the College with my
                        submissions in this regard.  I further understand and agree that
                        thereafter, the ICR Committee will consider my submissions and make
                        a determination regarding whether or not the recommendations, or
                        any of them, are reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of
                        them, constitute limitations or restrictions on my practice, and
                        that decision will be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, undertake that, following the decision
                        referenced in section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has
                        determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, hereby consent to the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are
                        terms, conditions or limitations on my practice and/or which the
                        ICR Committee has identified in its decision referenced in section
                        (7)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location that I practise or have privileges, including, but
                        not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, undertake and agree that I will submit to,
                        and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice
                        Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the
                        purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, give my irrevocable consent to the College
                        to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP") and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and
                  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may
                  constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee
                  of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and
                  understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained
                  independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or
                  have waived my right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking
                  constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of
                  registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand
                  that this Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that
                  is available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (14)  I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, acknowledge that the following summary will
                  appear on the College's Register that is available to the public during
                  the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Di Pierdomenico was the subject of a College matter related to
                        his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                        *     Dr. Di Pierdomenico will practise under the guidance of a
                              Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months. 
                        *     Dr. Di Pierdomenico's practice will be reassessed by an
                              assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months after
                              the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide the following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with
                  similar responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice
                  Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff
                  with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                  entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the
                  monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Di Pierdomenico, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which he or she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of
                        harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Fernando Di Pierdomenico to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 10, 2016:

Dr. Di Pierdomenico was the subject of a College matter related to his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Di Pierdomenico will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months.

• Dr. Di Pierdomenico’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months after the period of Clinical Supervision.