DiTullio, Sonia Maria (CPSO#: 88115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: Vaithilingam, Sonia Maria (used until: 09 Mar 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Ross Ave East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 360-0659
Fax: 705-412-4198
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonia DiTullio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. DiTullio ( CPSO# 88115 )

Business Address:
62 St Jean Street
Timmins ON  P4R 0A6
Phone Number: (405) 531-3322

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 360-0659

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA MARIA DITULLIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DITULLIO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010