Diaconita, Mariana (CPSO#: 82078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Black Creek Community Health Centre
2202 Jane St Unit5
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Phone: (416) 249-8000
Fax: (416) 249-4594
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough SH Clinic
160 Borough Drive
Toronto ON  M1P 4N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 338-7438
Fax: (416) 338-7438
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIANA DIACONITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIACONITA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Mar 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2006