Diamond, Rhonda Ruth (CPSO#: 66884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
45 Wolsey Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-3021
Fax: (807) 468-6964
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diamond Pedersen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pedersen ( CPSO# 68549 )
Dr. R. Diamond ( CPSO# 66884 )

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-3021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RHONDA RUTH DIAMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAMOND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995