Dias, Bryan Francis (CPSO#: 65451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road, Room C6-130
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3483
Fax: (519) 663-3499
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryan F. Dias Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dias ( CPSO# 65451 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Suite C6-130
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3483

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 6B5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3483

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN FRANCIS DIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993