Diavolitsis, Panagiotis (CPSO#: 91209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University College of Dublin, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thamesford Medical Clinic
PO Box 130
Unit 4
141 Dundas Street West
Thamesford ON  N0M 2M0
Phone: 519-285-3770
Fax: 519-285-3768
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Riverside Dr
London ON  N6H 1E5
Canada
Phone: 226-667-8061
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Chartwell Riverside Retirement Home
201 Riverside Dr
London ON  N6H 1E5
Canada
Phone: 226-667-8061
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Director at
Cargill Canada: Value added meat
Box 5004, 10 Cuddy Blvd
London ON  N5V 3S9
Canada
Phone: 1-519-453-4996
Fax: 519-453-2897
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Director at
Cargill Canada: Value added meat
Box 5004, 10 Cuddy Blvd
London ON  N5V 3S9
Canada
Phone: 519-453-4996
Fax: 519-453-2897
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Diavolitsis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Diavolitsis ( CPSO# 91209 )

Business Address:
Thamesford Medical Clinic
141 Dundas Street West
Unit 4
P.O. Box 130
Thamesford ON  N0M 2M0
Phone Number: (519) 285-3770

Business Address:
201 Riverside Drive
London ON  N6H 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 432-7909

Business Address:
10 Cuddy boulevard
London ON  N5V 5E3
Phone Number: (519) 453-4996

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PANAGIOTIS DIAVOLITSIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAVOLITSIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2009 to 19 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010