Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Dibble, Bradley Jon (CPSO#: 62143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pace Cardiology
Little Lake Medical Centre
Unit 302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 721-4422
Fax: (705) 721-5577
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bradley J. Dibble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dibble ( CPSO# 62143 )

Business Address:
Pace Cardiology
Little Lake Medical Centre
302 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 721-4422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY JON DIBBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIBBLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991