Dickson, Dann William (CPSO#: 55821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone: (519) 751-5579
Fax: 519-751-5578
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Fax: 519-751-5578
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dann Dickson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dickson ( CPSO# 55821 )

Business Address:
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone Number: (519) 751-5579

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 09 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANN WILLIAM DICKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICKSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988