Dicum, Francis Joseph Wilfred Doraraj (CPSO#: 19659)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Dicum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com Or: Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic Suite 301 1366 Yonge Street Toronto, ON M4T 3A7
Date Received: 07 Apr 2005

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015