Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Didomenicantonio, Gabriel (CPSO#: 56576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Laval University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Premier Imaging
4289 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1E 0A8
Phone: (613) 686-1904 Ext. 400
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CSS Gatineau
116 Boul Lionel Emond
Gatineau QC  J8Y 1W7
Canada
Phone: (819) 966-6298
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Didomenicantonio, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Didomenicantonio ( CPSO# 56576 )

Business Address:
Premier Imaging
2 - 1935 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3
Phone Number: (613) 521-4850

Business Address:
867 Notre Dame
Embrun ON  K0A 1W1
Phone Number: (613) 443-2095

Business Address:
4289 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1E 0A8

Business Address:
629 Principale Street
Casselman ON  K0A 1M0

Business Address:
Suite 560
1145 Hunt Club
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIEL DIDOMENICANTONIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIDOMENICANTONIO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1986