Dillon, Michael James (CPSO#: 54383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Klinic Community Health Centre
870 Portage Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3G 0P1
Phone: (204) 784-4090
Fax: (204) 784-4013
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win
Health Centre
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Canada
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: (807) 737-3384
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Gizhewaadiziwin Health Access Centr
1460 Idylwild Dr.
Box 686
Fort Frances ON  P9A 3M9
Canada
Phone: (807) 274-3131
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael J. Dillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dillon ( CPSO# 54383 )

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win
Health Centre
Box 909
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Business Address:
Riverside Health Care Facilities Inc
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7

Business Address:
Gizhewaadiziwn Health Access Centre
Box 686
Fort Frances ON  P9A 3M9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES DILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DILLON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1990