Dimitrakoudis, Helena Maria (CPSO#: 70176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
suite 4S-406
Sunnyside building
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 604-9500
Fax: (416) 604-1560
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Dimitrakoudis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dimitrakoudis ( CPSO# 70176 )

Business Address:
Suite 4S-406
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 604-9500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELENA MARIA DIMITRAKOUDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIMITRAKOUDIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 09 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1998