Dimock, John Leslie (CPSO#: 31666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1980

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 786-3102
Fax: (613) 234-4089
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Dimock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dimock ( CPSO# 31666 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 786-3102

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LESLIE DIMOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIMOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1980

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Dimock’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Dimock engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and conduct unbecoming a physician in a number of ways, including but not limited to the following: while participating in a Health Professions Appeal and Review Board (“HPARB”) Pre-Review Teleconference on August 17, 2016 and an HPARB hearing on October 5, 2016, Dr. Dimock referred to the complainant, a former patient, as “sociopathic”, implied that the complainant was a terrorist, stated that the complainant was committing insurance fraud, stated that the complainant had abducted his own son, and made disparaging remarks about the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“CPSO”), including that the CPSO is biased against him. It is further alleged that Dr. Dimock engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and conduct unbecoming a physician in his communications with B, a person in respect of whom he performed an Independent Medical Examination and in approximately December 2014, in his conduct towards and communications with colleagues with whom he practiced in the same office.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): January 10-12 + January 29, 2018