Dingle, Brian Henry (CPSO#: 30575)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Dingle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre London Regional Cancer Program 790 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 4L6
Date Received: 26 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017