Dionne, Jeanette Angela Clark (CPSO#: 67995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 218
119 Langstaff Drive
Carp ON  K0A 1L0
Phone: (613) 839-3271
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dionne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dionne ( CPSO# 67995 )
Dr. M. Dionne ( CPSO# 69024 )

Business Address:
119 Langstaff Drive
Carp ON  K0A 1L0
Phone Number: (613) 839-3271

Business Address:
College Square
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 224-6606

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEANETTE ANGELA CLARK DIONNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIONNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2006