Direnfeld, Samuel Mark (CPSO#: 103356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1265 Morningside Avenue
Suite 107
Toronto ON  M1B 3V9
Phone: 416-282-5773
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

343 Wilson Ave
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M3H1T1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3830 Lawrence Avenue E
Scarborough ON  M1G 1R6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL MARK DIRENFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIRENFELD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016