Dirks, Peter Benjamin (CPSO#: 60703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery, #1503
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6426
Fax: (416) 813-4975
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter B. Dirks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams ( CPSO# 63741 )
Dr. P. Dirks ( CPSO# 60703 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500


Corporation Name: Dr. Tara M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams ( CPSO# 63741 )
Dr. P. Dirks ( CPSO# 60703 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 12 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER BENJAMIN DIRKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIRKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1991