Dissanayake, Chaminda (CPSO#: 70324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: 519 623-2546
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

123 Pioneer Drive
Kitchener ON  N2P 2A3
Canada
Phone: (519) 772-2322
Fax: (519) 772-2323
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Dissanayake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dissanayake ( CPSO# 70324 )

Business Address:
123 Pioneer Drive
Kitchener ON  N2P 2A3
Phone Number: (519) 772-2322

Business Address:
13 Water Street North
Cambridge ON  N1R 3B2
Phone Number: (519) 772-2322

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2300

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHAMINDA DISSANAYAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DISSANAYAKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998