Dixon, Marjorie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anova Fertility &
Reproductive Health
Suite 650
25 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 6S6
Phone: (416) 225-4440
Fax: (416) 640-9454
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

790 Bay Street, 11th floor
toronto on
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7727 Ext. 2779
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Canada
Phone: (416) 972-0110
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marjorie E. Dixon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dixon ( CPSO# 71567 )

Business Address:
52 Fifshire Road
North York ON  M2L 2G6

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Bayview Campus
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
11th Floor
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-7727

Business Address:
Suite 210
150 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 2X9
Phone Number: (416) 972-0110

Business Address:
650 - 25 Sheppard Avenue West
North York ON  M2N 6S6

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARJORIE ELIZABETH DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2005