Djordjevic, M. Dragan (CPSO#: 56260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Belgrade, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6102
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Djordjevic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Djordjevic ( CPSO# 56260 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6269

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. M. DRAGAN DJORDJEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DJORDJEVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988