Do, Anh Phuong (CPSO#: 66717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 465-7421
Fax: (416) 465-6588
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-5807
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.J.M. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yee ( CPSO# 65339 )
Dr. A. Do ( CPSO# 66717 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room MG 371-B
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6815

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANH PHUONG DO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997