Dobbin, Karolyn Marie (CPSO#: 65003)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Dobbin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Jul 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2016