Dobkowski, Wojciech Boguslaw (CPSO#: 53833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wojciech B Dobkowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Dobkowski ( CPSO# 53833 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WOJCIECH BOGUSLAW DOBKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989