Dobson, James Crawford (CPSO#: 54076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trent Health in Motion
Trent University
1600 West Bank Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B8
Phone: (705) 743-0043
Fax: (705) 743-1922
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
Phone: 905-372-6811
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9H 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Crawford Dobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dobson ( CPSO# 54076 )

Business Address:
Trent Health in Motion
Trent University
1600 West Bank Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B8
Phone Number: (705) 743-0043

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES CRAWFORD DOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1989