Docheva, Diyana Staneva (CPSO#: 83176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, Russian

Education:National Medical University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fishermen Hospital
Geriatric Medicine Service
14 High Street
Lunenburg NS  B0J 2C0
Phone: (902) 529-2102
Fax: (902) 530-5283
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5254
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIYANA STANEVA DOCHEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCHEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 09 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Dec 2009 to 29 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Oct 2010 to 24 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Oct 2011 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012