Docrat, Zohra (CPSO#: 55852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Medical Centre
1 - 221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone: (519) 753-8666 Ext. 204
Fax: (519) 753-3109
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

73 GEORGE STREET
Brantford ON  N3T 2Y3
Canada
Phone: 519-756-8228 Ext. 5803
Fax: 519-756-9092
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zohra Docrat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Docrat ( CPSO# 55852 )

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Business Address:
194 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G7
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
103 Darling Street
Brantford ON  N3T 2Y3
Phone Number: (519) 756-8228

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZOHRA DOCRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCRAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987