Doey, Tamison Marie (CPSO#: 31304)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Feller, Tamison Marie (used until: 15 Apr 1981 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tamison Doey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 26 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Maryville Family and Adolescent Centre 3640 Wells Ave Windsor ON N9C 1T9
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1978 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tamison Marie Doey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 28, 2017:

The College received information about Dr. Doey’s standard of practice, arising from an assessment of her practice. As a result of the assessment, Dr. Doey was required to complete professional education in mental health law.

Prior to completing the professional education, Dr. Doey ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.