Doherty, Timothy John (CPSO#: 70076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hobbins Building,Parkwood Institute
St. Joseph's Health Care
550 Wellington Rd
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4292 Ext. 45062
Fax: (519) 685-4017
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 663-3236
Fax: (519) 663-3328
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.J. Doherty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Doherty ( CPSO# 70076 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 684-4292

Business Address:
University Campus
L H S C
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN DOHERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOHERTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000