Dolan, Michael Clifford (CPSO#: 27582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: (613) 256-0949
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Dolan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dolan ( CPSO# 27582 )

Business Address:
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-9370

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CLIFFORD DOLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Nov 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1986