Donnelly, Mary Sandra (CPSO#: 58696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L5R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57980
Fax: (905) 494-6635
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandra Donnelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Donnelly ( CPSO# 58696 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
N.3.862
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY SANDRA DONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONNELLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1987